MS HC59 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The West Point High School Football Team And Head Coach Chris Chambless For Their Outstanding 2017 Season And For Winning Their Second Straight Mississippi High School Activities Association (mhsaa) Class 5a State Football Championship.
Title
West Point High School; commend on winning Class 5A State Football Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Karl Gibbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred To Rules |