MS HC58 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Honoring Colonel Stanley A. Martin Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Colonel Stanley A. Martin; commend service upon retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred To Rules |