MS HC58 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The 2019-2020 Saint Andrew's Episcopal School "saints" Boys Basketball Team Upon Winning The 2020 Mhsaa Class 3a State Basketball Championship And The Teams Fourth Consecutive Class 3a State Basketball Championship.
Title
Saint Andrew's Episcopal School "Saints" Boys Basketball Team; commend upon winning MHSAA Class 3A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-06-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-06-26 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred To Rules |