MS HC58 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Acknowledging And Commending The Remarkable Service Of Walter J. Ryan As Announcer For The Ocean Springs High School Greyhounds Football Team Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Walter J. Ryan; commend upon retiring as announcer for Ocean Springs High School football.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-11 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-11 | Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Referred To Rules |