MS HC57 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Further Economic Ties And Friendship Between The Republic Of China (taiwan) And The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Republic of China (Taiwan) and Mississippi; encourage further economic ties and friendship between.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Rules |