MS HC54 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Saluting The Heroic Service Of World War Ii Ace Fighter Pilot And Former Biloxi Mayor, Businessman And State Representative Jeremiah Joseph "jerry" O'keefe, Iii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jerry O'Keefe; commend his life and service upon his passing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-02-23HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-02-22SenateReturned For Enrolling
2017-02-22SenateImmediate Release
2017-02-22SenateAdopted
2017-02-22SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2017-02-21SenateReferred To Rules
2017-02-20HouseTransmitted To Senate
2017-02-20HouseImmediate Release
2017-02-20HouseAdopted
2017-02-16HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2017-02-07HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback