MS HC54 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commemorating The Life Of William Douglas "doug" Mcqueen And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Doug McQueen; commend his life upon his passing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-18 - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-22SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-02-18SenateReturned For Enrolling
2016-02-18SenateImmediate Release
2016-02-18SenateAdopted
2016-02-17SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2016-02-16SenateReferred To Rules
2016-02-16HouseTransmitted To Senate
2016-02-16HouseImmediate Release
2016-02-16HouseAdopted
2016-02-15HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2016-02-08HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback