MS HC54 | 2015 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Hinds Community College 2014 Eagle Baseball Team Upon Winning The National Junior College Athletic Association 2014 Region Xxiii Title, Placing Second At The Mississippi Association Of Community And Junior Colleges 2014 State Championship, And Having A Spectacular Season.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Hinds Community College Eagles Baseball Team; commend and congratulate upon winning the NJCAA 2014 Region XXIII Title and impressive 2014 season.


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2015-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2015-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2015-02-24SenateReturned For Enrolling
2015-02-24SenateImmediate Release
2015-02-24SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2015-02-19SenateReferred To Rules
2015-02-19HouseTransmitted To Senate
2015-02-19HouseImmediate Release
2015-02-18HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2015-02-17HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources

Bill Comments