MS HC54 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2009 Ole Miss Rebels Football Team For An Outstanding Season That Concluded With A Convincing Victory In The At&t Cotton Bowl Classic And A No. 20 National Ranking.
Title
2009 Ole Miss Rebels Football Team; commend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-24 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-02-05 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-02-05 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-05 | Adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-02-03 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-02-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-03 | Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-29 | Referred To Rules |