MS HC51 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Northwest Mississippi Community College Cheer Team And Coach Brandon Casey For Winning The 2022 Open Small Co-ed National Championship.
Title
Northwest Mississippi Community College Cheer Team; commend upon winning the 2022 Open Small Co-Ed National Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-22 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Rules |