MS HC51 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The State Library Upon The Spectacular Occasion Of Its 200th Anniversary.
Title
State Library; commend upon its 200th year anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-06 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |