MS HC5 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Melissa Cookston For Her Outstanding Success As A Restaurateur, Chef, And Author.
Title
Melissa Cookston; commend success as a restaurateur, chef and author.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2024-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Immediate Release |
2024-03-06 | House | Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-01-17 | House | Referred To Rules |