MS HC49 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Locke Ward, A Life Long Resident Of Jackson, Mississippi, For His Determination And Amazing Efforts To Revitalize Our Capital City And Honor Him For Galvanizing Others To Do The Same.
Title
Locke Ward; commend for efforts to revitalize our capital city and honor for galvanizing others to do the same.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2024-04-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2024-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred To Rules |