MS HC49 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life And Distinguished Legacy Of Esteemed Public Service Of The Honorable Judge Houston J. Patton And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Honorable Judge Houston J. Patton; mourn loss and commend life and legacy of service upon his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Rules |