MS HC47 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Proposing To Amend The Mississippi Constitution Of 1890 By Amending Section 140 And Repealing Sections 141, 142 And 143 To Provide That The Person Receiving A Majority Of The Votes For The Office Of Governor And All Statewide Elected Officials At The General Election Shall Be Declared Elected; To Provide That If No Person Receives A Majority Of The Votes, Then A Runoff Election Shall Be Held As Provided By General Law; To Abolish The Requirement That The Governor And All Statewide Elected Officials Be Elected By Vote Of The House Of Representatives If No Person Receives Both A Majority Of The Popular Vote And A Majority Of The Electoral Votes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Constitution; remove the electoral vote requirement for the Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Johnson,Branning,Bryan |
2020-06-24 | House | Conferees Named Shanks,Eubanks,Beckett |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted As Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Adopted As Amended |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DR - TSDBAA: CS To EL |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Constitution;Elections |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Constitution |