MS HC46 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating April 11-17, 2022, As "the Phillip Cameron Hendry Mississippi Mosquito And West Nile Virus Awareness Week" To Promote Awareness Of The Importance Of Effectively Managing Mosquitoes And The Prevention Of West Nile Virus.
Title
"Phillip Cameron Hendry Mississippi Mosquito and West Nile Virus Awareness Week"; designate April 11-17, 2022, as.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tullos [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred To Rules |