MS HC45 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Expressing The Will Of The Legislature In Recognizing The Rights Of Mississippi Citizens To Hunt, Fish, Trap And Harvest Wildlife And Fish.
Title
Hunting and fishing; recognize rights of citizens to engage in.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Died In Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-01-20 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-20 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-20 | Adopted | |
2011-01-19 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Rules |