MS HC44 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2023-2024 Northwest Community College Women's Soccer Team And Head Coach James Beattie Upon Winning The National Community And Junior College Athletic Association (ncjaa) Regions 23 Women's Soccer State Championship.
Title
Northwest Mississippi Community College Women's Soccer Team; commend on winning NCJAA Region 23 Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2024-04-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred To Rules |