MS HC42 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Expressing The Profound Sorrow Of The Legislature On The Loss Of Off-duty Mississippi Highway Patrol Corporal Kenneth Joshlin "josh" Smith Of Walnut, Mississippi, And Extending Deepest Sympathy To His Bereaved Family.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporal Kenneth Joshlin "Josh" Smith; commend life and service of upon his passing.

Sponsors

Rep. Nick Bain [D]Rep. Shane Aguirre [R]Rep. Jeramey Anderson [D]Rep. Otis Anthony [N]
Rep. William Arnold [R]Rep. Willie Bailey [D]Rep. Mark Baker [R]Rep. Earle Banks [D]
Rep. David Baria [D]Rep. Shane Barnett [R]Rep. Manly Barton [R]Rep. Charles Beckett [R]
Rep. Donnie Bell [D]Rep. Christopher Bell [D]Rep. Richard Bennett [R]Rep. Edward Blackmon [D]
Rep. Joel Bomgar [R]Rep. Scott Bounds [R]Rep. Randy Boyd [R]Rep. Chris Brown [R]
Rep. Clara Burnett [D]Rep. Charles Busby [R]Rep. Larry Byrd [R]Rep. Credell Calhoun [D]
Rep. Lester Carpenter [R]Rep. Gary Chism [R]Rep. Bryant Clark [D]Rep. Alyce Clarke [D]
Rep. Angela Cockerham [D]Rep. John Corley [R]Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R]Rep. Dana Criswell [R]
Rep. Becky Currie [R]Rep. Scott DeLano [R]Rep. William Denny [R]Rep. Oscar Denton [D]
Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D]Rep. Jarvis Dortch [D]Rep. Dan Eubanks [R]Rep. Casey Eure [R]
Rep. Michael Evans [D]Rep. Bob Evans [D]Rep. John Faulkner [D]Rep. Kevin Ford [R]
Rep. Robert Foster [R]Rep. Karl Gibbs [D]Rep. Debra Gibbs [D]Rep. Jeffrey Guice [R]
Rep. Philip Gunn [R]Rep. Jeff Hale [R]Rep. Greg Haney [R]Rep. Jeffery Harness [N]
Rep. Ashley Henley [R]Rep. John Hines [D]Rep. Stephen Holland [D]Rep. Gregory Holloway [D]
Rep. Joey Hood [R]Rep. Steve Hopkins [R]Rep. Kevin Horan [D]Rep. Stephen Horne [R]
Rep. Mac Huddleston [R]Rep. Abe Hudson [D]Rep. Jay Hughes [D]Rep. Lataisha Jackson [D]
Rep. Chris Johnson [R]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Kabir Karriem [D]Rep. Bill Kinkade [R]
Rep. Timmy Ladner [R]Rep. John Lamar [R]Rep. Vince Mangold [R]Rep. Steve Massengill [R]
Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R]Rep. Doug McLeod [R]Rep. Roun McNeal [R]Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R]
Rep. Carl Mickens [D]Rep. Tom Miles [D]Rep. Sam Mims [R]Rep. Ken Morgan [R]
Rep. David Myers [D]Rep. Karl Oliver [R]Rep. Orlando Paden [D]Rep. Randall Patterson [D]
Rep. Bill Pigott [R]Rep. Brent Powell [R]Rep. John Read [R]Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D]
Rep. Rob Roberson [R]Rep. Margaret Rogers [R]Rep. Ray Rogers [R]Rep. Tracey Rosebud [D]
Rep. Randal Rushing [R]Rep. Noah Sanford [R]Rep. Donnie Scoggin [R]Rep. Omeria Scott [D]
Rep. Fred Shanks [R]Rep. William Shirley [R]Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R]Rep. Greg Snowden [R]
Rep. Gary Staples [R]Rep. Jody Steverson [R]Rep. Rufus Straughter [D]Rep. Preston Sullivan [D]
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D]Rep. Cheikh Taylor [D]Rep. Mark Tullos [R]Rep. Jerry Turner [R]
Rep. Kenneth Walker [D]Rep. Price Wallace [R]Rep. Percy Watson [D]Rep. Tom Weathersby [R]
Rep. Jason White [R]Rep. Stacey Wilkes [R]Rep. Sonya Williams-Barnes [D]Rep. Patricia Willis [R]
Rep. Cory Wilson [R]Rep. Charles Young [D]Rep. Henry Zuber [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-02-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-02-06SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-02-06SenateImmediate Release
2019-02-06SenateAdopted
2019-02-06SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-05SenateReferred To Rules
2019-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-05HouseImmediate Release
2019-02-05HouseAdopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback