MS HC42 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing All Of Aarp's Contributions To The State Of Mississippi, And Designating February 9, 2017, As Aarp Mississippi Day At The Capitol.
Title
AARP Mississippi Day at the Capitol; designate February 9, 2017, as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-01-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |