MS HC42 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Acknowledging And Commending The Reputable Service And Community Engagement Of The Tennessee Valley Authority And Congratulating Its Enduring History Of Professionalism On The Occasion Of Celebrating Its 80th Anniversary.
Title
Tennessee Valley Authority; commend and congratulate on the occasion of its 80th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-11 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-11 | House | Adopted |
2014-02-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred To Rules |