MS HC40 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Honoring The Life, Legacy And Service Of William Forrest Winter, Former Governor Of The State Of Mississippi, And Expressing Great Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Governor William Winter; commend life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2021-03-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-03-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred To Rules |