MS HC39 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Proposing An Amendment To Sections 33, 56, 61 And 72, Mississippi Constitution Of 1890, To Provide That The People Reserve To Themselves The Right To Propose New Laws And To Amend Or Repeal Existing Laws By Initiative, And To Approve Or Reject The Same In An Election Independent Of The Legislature; To Provide That Such An Initiative Measure May Be Proposed By A Petition Signed Over A Twelve-month Period By Qualified Electors Equal In Number To At Least Twelve Percent Of The Votes For All Candidates For Governor In The Last Gubernatorial Election; To Provide That The Signatures Of The Qualified Electors From Any Congressional District Shall Not Exceed The Total Number Of Signatures Required To Qualify An Initiative Measure For Placement On The Ballot Divided By The Number Of Congressional Districts In Existence On The Day That The Petition Is Filed; To Provide That No More Than Five Initiative Measures May Be Submitted To The Voters On A Single Ballot, And The First Five Initiative Measures Submitted To The Secretary Of State With Sufficient Petitions Shall Be The Measures That Are Submitted To The Voters; To Provide That In Order To Be Approved, An Initiative Measure Must Receive A Majority Of The Votes Cast And Not Less Than Forty Percent Of The Total Votes Cast At The Election At Which The Initiative Measure Was Submitted; To Provide That If Conflicting Initiative Measures Are Approved At The Same Election, The Initiative Measure Receiving The Highest Number Of Affirmative Votes Shall Prevail And Become Law; To Provide That The Legislature Shall Provide By Law The Manner In Which Initiative Petitions Shall Be Circulated, Presented And Certified; To Provide That The Mississippi Constitution Shall Only Be Amended By A Proposed Amendment Being Passed By Two-thirds Vote Of Each House Of The Legislature And Upon Receiving A Majority Vote When Placed On The Ballot To Be Voted Upon By The Qualified Electors Of The State; And Proposing An Amendment To Section 273, Mississippi Constitution Of 1890, To Delete The Provisions Authorizing Constitutional Amendments By Initiative;
Title
Constitution; amend to provide that people have the right to propose new statutes and to amend or repeal existing statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 92 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 92 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Died In Conference |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Shanks,Bain,McLean |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Polk,Thompson,Blackwell |
2022-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Shanks,Bain,Wright |
2022-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Adopted As Amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Adopted As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2022-02-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (McCray, Shanks, Hobgood-Wilkes) |
2022-02-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Constitution |