MS HC39 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Further Economic Ties And Friendship Between The Republic Of China (taiwan) And The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Republic of China (Taiwan) and Mississippi; encourage further economic ties and friendship between.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-06SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-06SenateImmediate Release
2019-03-06SenateAdopted
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-02-05SenateReferred To Rules
2019-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-05HouseImmediate Release
2019-02-05HouseAdopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback