MS HC37 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Laudable Career And Distinguished Service Of Dr. Clyde Muse As President Of Hinds Community College And Congratulating Him Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement On June 30, 2020, After 42 Years Of Remarkable Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Clyde Muse; commend laudable career and distinguished service of upon the occasion of his retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-18HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-12SenateReturned For Enrolling
2020-06-11SenateAdopted
2020-05-14SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2020-05-12SenateReferred To Rules
2020-03-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-10HouseImmediate Release
2020-03-10HouseAdopted
2020-03-06HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2020-02-17HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback