MS HC30 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Outstanding Accomplishments Of And Congratulating The Six Stellar High School Athletes Who Were Named Recipients Of The 2020 Mississippi High School Activities Association (mhsaa) Mr. Football Award.
Title
2020 MHSAA Mr. Football Award recipients; commend and congratulate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-03 | House | Adopted |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Rules |