MS HC3 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Mr. Tyrone Keys On His Many Accomplishments As A National Football League Legend And Former Member Of The Chicago Bears 1985 Super Bowl Xx Winning Team And Creating The "all Sports Community Service" Organization Which Is Dedicated To Helping Disadvantaged Youth.
Title
Mr. Tyrone Keys; commend for athletic accomplishments and creating the "All Sports Community Service" organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred To Rules |