MS HC27 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Pearl High School Pirates Football Team And Head Coach John Perry For Winning The School's First Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 6a State Football Championship.
Title
Pearl High School Football Team; commend upon winning MHSAA Class 6A State Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Rogers [R] | Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Andy Gipson [R] | Rep. Brent Powell [R] |
Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-18 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Rules |