MS HC27 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on January 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Passed on January 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Brittney Reese Upon Winning The Gold Medal In Women's Long Jump At The 2012 Olympic Summer Games In London, England.
Title
Brittany Reese; commend upon winning gold medal in Olympic long jump.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2013-01-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-01-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred To Rules |