MS HC24 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating The Life And Remembering The Legacy And Distinguished Service Of Mississippi Civil Rights Icon Fannie Lou Hamer, Of Ruleville, Mississippi, Upon The Occasion Of Her 100th Birthday.
Title
Fannie Lou Hamer; commend her life and legacy upon the occasion of her 100th birthday.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Toby Barker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |