MS HC23 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Distinguished And Meritorious Service Of Lieutenant Colonel Dr. Michael B. Hogan, Rendered To The United States Of America, And Congratulating Him Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Lieutenant Colonel Mike Hogan; commend upon his retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred To Rules |