MS HC21 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Providing For A Joint Session Of The Mississippi Legislature To Hear The State Of The State Address Of Governor Tate Reeves.
Title
State of the State address of the Governor; call joint session to hear.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-01-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2021-01-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-01-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-01-22 | House | Adopted |
2021-01-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Rules |