MS HC21 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Life, Legacy And Service Of Mr. John Leland Mauney And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
John Leland Mauney; commend life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-02 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred To Rules |