MS HC20 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Tori Bowie For Her Numerous Athletic Accolades In The Sport Of Track And Field, Particularly Her Gold Medal In The 4x100 Meter Relay, Silver Medal In The 100 Meter Dash, And Bronze Medal In The 200 Meter Dash During The 2016 Summer Olympic Games In Rio De Janeiro, Brazil.
Title
Tori Bowie; commend for winning gold, silver and bronze medals in track and field during 2016 Summer Olympic Games.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Miles [D] | Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. Earle Banks [D] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] |
Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. Rufus Straughter [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-01-25 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |