MS HC2 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Providing For A Joint Session Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate On January 14, 2020, For The Inauguration Of And To Hear The Message Of Governor Tate Reeves.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Session; provide for the inauguration of and to hear the message of Governor Tate Reeves.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-01-10HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-01-10SenateReturned For Enrolling
2020-01-10SenateImmediate Release
2020-01-10SenateAdopted
2020-01-09SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2020-01-09SenateReferred To Rules
2020-01-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-01-08HouseImmediate Release
2020-01-08HouseAdopted
2020-01-08HouseTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2020-01-08HouseReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback