MS HC16 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Life And Legacy Of Mr. Calvin Huey, The First African American To Play Football For The Naval Academy.
Title
Calvin Huey; commend the many accomplishments of.
Sponsors
Rep. David Baria [D] | Rep. Sonya Williams-Barnes [D] | Rep. Jeramey Anderson [D] | Rep. Charles Busby [R] |
Rep. Cory Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-01-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-17 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |