MS HC14 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43-2)
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43-2)
Status: Passed on February 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Honoring Veterans Of The Vietnam War, Especially Representative Manly Barton And Representative Mac Huddleston, Who Were Exposed To Agent Orange.
Title
Vietnam War Veterans; recognize and honor those exposed to Agent Orange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Adopted As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Adopted As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-02 | House | Adopted As Amended |
2022-02-02 | House | Amended |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred To Rules |