MS HC14 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating The Life And Legacy Of Jarious "jay" Holloway, And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Jarious "Jay" Holloway; commend life and legacy upon passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-01-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-01-27 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred To Rules |