MS HC132 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Omega Psi Phi Fraternity, Inc., For Its Dedication To Create Social Improvement Within The Community And Congratulating The Organization On The Occasion Of Its Centennial Anniversary.
Title
Omega Psi Phi Fraternity, Inc.; commend and congratulate on its 100th anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Espy [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-25 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-25 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-25 | Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Rules |