MS HC13 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commemorating The Life And Legacy Of Dr. Barbara Yvonne Hamilton And Expressing Sympathy Upon Her Passing.
Title
Dr. Barbara Hamilton; commemorate life and express sympathy upon her passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |