MS HC121 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Extend The 2010 Regular Session Of The Legislature For A Period Of Thirty Days From The Final Day Of The Ninety-day Session; To Authorize The House And Senate To Adjourn For More Than Three Days; To Provide That The House And Senate Shall Reconvene On April 20, 2010; To Suspend The Deadlines For The Purpose Of Permitting The Further Consideration, Filing And Adoption Of Conference Reports On Appropriation Bills And On House Bill No. 1059; To Amend Joint Rule 40 For The 2010 Regular Session Only To Change The Deadlines Applicable To General Bills And Constitutional Amendments For Concurring In Amendments From The Other House, Filing Conference Reports, First Consideration Of Conference Reports, Filing Conference Reports That Were Recommitted For Further Conference, Adoption Of Conference Reports After Recommittal, And Disposing Of Motions To Reconsider Conference Reports; To Provide That It Is The Intention Of The Legislature To Pass A Balanced Budget Within The Time Period Provided For By This Resolution; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Legislature; extend session, set return date, suspend deadlines for certain bills, change deadlines for general bill conf. rpts.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Adopted As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Failed (Y: 79 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - House Failed (Y: 76 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Adopted As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Failed (Y: 79 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - House Failed (Y: 76 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-25 | Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-25 | Adopted As Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-24 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-24 | Failed | |
2010-03-24 | Amended | |
2010-03-24 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-23 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-23 | Failed | |
2010-03-23 | Amendment Failed | |
2010-03-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Referred To Rules |