MS HC113 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating Singing River Electric Power Association Upon Its 75th Anniversary.
Title
Singing River Electric Power Association; congratulate upon the occasion of its 75th anniversary.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2013-04-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-04-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-30 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Referred To Rules |