MS HC108 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Northwest Rankin High School Lady Cougars Basketball Team For Their Outstanding 2010-2011 Season And For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 6a State Championship.
Title
Northwest Rankin High School Lady Cougars Basketball Team; commend and congratulate on winning the Class 6A State Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] | Rep. Andy Gipson [R] | Rep. Kevin McGee [R] | Rep. John Moore [R] |
Rep. Ray Rogers [R] | Rep. Tom Weathersby [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-23 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-23 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-23 | Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-17 | Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Referred To Rules |