MS HC108 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Special Olympics Mississippi Team For Their Outstanding Achievements And Extending Best Wishes For Their Success At The Special Olympics 2010 Usa National Games.
Title
Special Olympics Mississippi Team; commend outstanding achievements of.
Sponsors
Rep. Noal Akins [R] | Rep. Toby Barker [R] | Rep. Sidney Bondurant [D] | Rep. William Denny [R] |
Rep. Rita Martinson [R] | Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. Russ Nowell [D] | Rep. Margaret Rogers [R] |
Rep. Mary Ann Stevens [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-23 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-23 | Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-18 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-18 | Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Referred To Rules |