MS HC105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Exceptional Works Of The Mississippi Access To Justice Commission On Its 12th Year Anniversary And Declaring The Month Of June 2018 As Access To Justice Month In The State Of Mississippi.
Title
Access to Justice Month; declare June 2018 as month of observance in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2018-03-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-27 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-03-25 | House | Referred To Rules |