MS HC105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life, Legacy And Public Service Of Enterprise Police Chief Randy Junior Boykin And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family And Friends Upon His Passing.
Title
Chief Randy L. Boykin; commend life, legacy and public service of upon his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2013-03-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-28 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |