MS HC10 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-45-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-45-1)
Status: Passed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Honoring The Life And Legacy Of The Honorable And Distinguished Gentleman From Lafayette County, Former Representative Noal Akins, And Expressing Deepest Sympathy To His Family, Friends And Community Upon His Passing.
Title
Former Representative Noal Akins; honor life and legacy upon his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2023-01-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-01-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-01-25 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred To Rules |