MS HC10 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Providing For A Joint Session Of The Mississippi Legislature To Hear The State Of The State Address Of Governor Phil Bryant.
Title
Joint session; call to hear State of the State address of Governor Phil Bryant.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-01-10 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred To Rules |