MS HB999 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Define Certain Terms Relating To Amusement Ride Requirements; To Provide The Requirements For An Application To Operate Amusement Rides In The State Of Mississippi; To Require An Inspector To Have Certain Certifications Before Inspecting Amusement Rides; To Provide Inspection Requirements For Amusement Rides; To Provide Requirements For Operators And Patrons Of Amusement Rides; To Require Incident Reporting; To Provide For Incident Investigation; To Exempt Nonprofit Owners/operators Who Operate 10 Rides Or Less; To Bring Forward Section 21-19-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relates To The Regulation Of Amusement Parks And Other Events, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Amusement rides; provide inspection and incident reporting requirements for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Property |