MS HB989 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-151-97, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify The Financial Information Public School Districts Must Provide To The State Superintendent Of Public Education, To Be Included In The Superintendent's Annual Legislative Report; To Amend Sections 37-1-12, 37-3-11 And 37-9-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; To Amend Section 37-57-104, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Local Governing Authority Of Any School District Operating With A Budget Greater Than One Hundred Percent (100%) Of The State Funding Formula, From Granting An Automatic Increase In Tax Levy To Satisfy A School District's Budget Requests, Even If The Millage Rate Necessary To Generate The Requested Funds Is Equal To 55 Mills Or Less, But The Dollar Amount Requested By The School Board Does Not Exceed The Next Preceding Fiscal Year's Ad Valorem Tax Effort In Dollars By More Than Four Percent; To Amend Section 37-57-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Bring Forward Sections 37-57-107 And 37-61-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendments; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district funding; provide for content of financial reports and prohibiting automatic budget increases for certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AC |
2020-02-20 | House | DR - TSDP: AC To ED |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Education |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB0989.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0989IN.htm |